TX HJR42 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment for the creation of an endowment fund for this state and for the retention, transfer, or appropriation of fund assets, including investment earnings received on fund assets.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment for the creation of an endowment fund for this state and for the retention, transfer, or appropriation of fund assets, including investment earnings received on fund assets.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR42 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00042I.htm |