TX HJR36 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development Board to provide assistance to economically distressed areas.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the issuance of additional general obligation bonds by the Texas Water Development Board to provide assistance to economically distressed areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Armando Walle [D] |
Rep. Andrew Murr [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - Adopted RV#1028 (Y: 113 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMICALLY DISTRESSED AREAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General