TX HJR27 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-06 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the creation of a regional mobility authority by local law.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the creation of a regional mobility authority by local law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB333 (Enabled by) 2019-04-29 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR27 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00027I.htm |