TX HJR21 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing a constitutional amendment abolishing school district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing a constitutional amendment abolishing school district maintenance and operations ad valorem taxes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-03HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-08-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-08-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-08-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-08-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-08-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-24HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-07-24HouseRead first time
2017-07-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB82 (Enabled by) 2017-08-02 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback