TX HJR21 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring that any appropriations in excess of the constitutional spending limit be approved by a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to each house of the legislature.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring that any appropriations in excess of the constitutional spending limit be approved by a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to each house of the legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Legislature
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HJR21 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HJ00021I.htm |