TX HJR21 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who died before the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for such a veteran took effect.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature to provide for an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran who died before the law authorizing a residence homestead exemption for such a veteran took effect.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB214 (Enabled by) 2013-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Legislature
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Legislature
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions