TX HJR150 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the system of public free schools to be globally competitive.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the system of public free schools to be globally competitive.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HJR150 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HJ00150I.htm |