TX HJR102 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to set a lower limit on the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to authorize the legislature to set a lower limit on the maximum appraised value of a residence homestead for ad valorem taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1943 (Enabled by) 2013-05-04 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Homestead
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HJR102 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HJ00102I.htm |