TX HCR99 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring Israel a major strategic ally of Texas.
Title
Declaring Israel a major strategic ally of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Adopted RV#1045 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | House | Filed |