TX HCR97 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-14 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-14 - Withdrawn from calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of H. Philip "Flip" Whitworth of Austin.
Title
In memory of H. Philip "Flip" Whitworth of Austin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2023-04-14 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HCR97 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HC00097I.htm |