TX HCR94 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to designate the Chisholm Trail and the Great Western Trail as National Historic Trails.
Title
Urging the U.S. Congress to designate the Chisholm Trail and the Great Western Trail as National Historic Trails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HCR 94Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-03-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHISHOLM TRAIL
GREAT WESTERN TRAIL
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
GREAT WESTERN TRAIL
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress