TX HCR91 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the State Preservation Board to approve the construction of a replica of the National Life Monument at the State Capitol Complex.
Title
Authorizing the State Preservation Board to approve the construction of a replica of the National Life Monument at the State Capitol Complex.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Shelby Slawson [R] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Rep. Ellen Troxclair [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR24 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SCR24 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
SCR24 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
NATIONAL LIFE MONUMENT
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
PRESERVATION BOARD, STATE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS