TX HCR88 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to revise funding formulas for Targeted Infrastructure Capability grants to emphasize threat assessment rather than population.
Title
Urging Congress to revise funding formulas for Targeted Infrastructure Capability grants to emphasize threat assessment rather than population.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Adopted RV#1350 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-01 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress