TX HCR87 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to direct the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.
Title
Urging Congress to direct the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Adopted RV#489 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES
ELLINGTON FIELD JOINT RESERVE BASE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES AFRICA COMMAND
ELLINGTON FIELD JOINT RESERVE BASE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES AFRICA COMMAND