TX HCR87 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to expand the Healthy Incentives Pilot for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to communities across the country.
Title
Urging Congress to expand the Healthy Incentives Pilot for Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients to communities across the country.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-18 | Record vote | |
2011-05-18 | Failed of adoption | |
2011-05-18 | Laid before the House | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | |
2011-05-09 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |