TX HCR84 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending mental health professionals on the occasion of National Mental Health Month.
Title
Commending mental health professionals on the occasion of National Mental Health Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - HCR 84Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-05 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-04 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-23 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |