TX HCR8 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Adopted RV#48 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Filed with the Secretary of State
2019-03-18SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-03-18HouseSigned in the House
2019-03-14HouseReported enrolled
2019-03-13HouseSenate passage reported
2019-03-12SenateRecord vote
2019-03-12SenateAdopted
2019-03-12SenateRead
2019-03-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-03-12SenateReceived from the House
2019-03-11HouseRecord vote RV#48
2019-03-11HouseAdopted
2019-03-11HouseRules suspended
2019-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback