TX HCR79 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Memorializing Congress to refine Department of Homeland Security policy to consider risk levels as well as population size in assessing the financial needs of first responders in border communities along the international boundary created by the Rio Grande.
Title
Memorializing Congress to refine Department of Homeland Security policy to consider risk levels as well as population size in assessing the financial needs of first responders in border communities along the international boundary created by the Rio Grande.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Adopted | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-04-14 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-09 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-09 | Adopted | |
2009-04-09 | Laid before the House | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-01 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-31 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-26 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-26 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress