TX HCR76 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Paying tribute to the life of U.S. Army Master Sergeant Roy Perez Benavidez.
Title
Paying tribute to the life of U.S. Army Master Sergeant Roy Perez Benavidez.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |