TX HCR73 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to designate the Butterfield Overland Trail as a National Historic Trail.
Title
Urging Congress to designate the Butterfield Overland Trail as a National Historic Trail.
Sponsors
Rep. Reggie Smith [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. John Bucy [D] |
Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Adopted RV#749 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#749 |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SCR23 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Water & Rural Affairs
Subjects
BUTTERFIELD OVERLAND TRAIL
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress