TX HCR72 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Rejecting unlimited submission to the current administration and Congress, reaffirming the sovereignty of our state, and opposing taxes imposed on the citizens of Texas by the passage of the Affordable Care Act.
Title
Rejecting unlimited submission to the current administration and Congress, reaffirming the sovereignty of our state, and opposing taxes imposed on the citizens of Texas by the passage of the Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |