TX HCR62 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the second week in October as Indigenous Peoples' Week for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the second week in October as Indigenous Peoples' Week for a 10-year period beginning in 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1674 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - Adopted RV#944 (Y: 124 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1674
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateAdopted
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Administration
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-12SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-11HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#944
2021-05-11HouseAdopted
2021-05-11HouseLaid before the House
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HCR62
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00062I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00062H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00062S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HC00062F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HC00062E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HC00062S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HCR62&RcdVtNo=944&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HCR62&RcdVtNo=1674&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=97

Bill Comments 750

feedback