TX HCR62 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of William Parks Johnson of Wimberley.
Title
In memory of William Parks Johnson of Wimberley.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-04-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-04-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-30 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed |