TX HCR61 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing opposition to federal interference in state management of Texas' water resources.
Title
Expressing opposition to federal interference in state management of Texas' water resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to State Sovereignty, Select | |
2011-02-28 | Correction in referral | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |