TX HCR6 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of El Paso County Commissioner Daniel Richard Haggerty.
Title
In memory of El Paso County Commissioner Daniel Richard Haggerty.
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] | Rep. Naomi Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-07-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-07-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-07-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-07-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Printed in full |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2013-07-25 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-07-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-07-11 | House | Adopted |
2013-07-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-09 | House | Filed |