TX HCR59 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to pass a budget.
Title
Urging Congress to pass a budget.
Sponsors
Rep. Ernest Bailes [R] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] | Rep. Leighton Schubert [R] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Sen. Charles Creighton [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Adopted RV#240 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Adopted RV#240 (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed |