TX HCR58 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Condemning the American Law Institute's 2018 Restatement of the Law of Liability Insurance and discouraging courts from relying on the Restatement as an authoritative reference regarding established rules and principles of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condemning the American Law Institute's 2018 Restatement of the Law of Liability Insurance and discouraging courts from relying on the Restatement as an authoritative reference regarding established rules and principles of law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback