TX HCR56 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the lieutenant governor and speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
Title
Authorizing the lieutenant governor and speaker to appoint interim joint committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-28 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed |