TX HCR55 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Betty Lamb on her retirement from the Coastal Bend Council of Governments.
Title
Congratulating Betty Lamb on her retirement from the Coastal Bend Council of Governments.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] |
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-03-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-22 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |