TX HCR53 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-17 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 18, 2015.
Title
Inviting the chief justice of the Supreme Court of Texas to address a joint session of the legislature on February 18, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-17 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-10 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-02-02 | House | Record vote |
2015-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed |