TX HCR52 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-12 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 6, 2019, and ending on Monday, February 11, 2019.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 6, 2019, and ending on Monday, February 11, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Adopted RV#26 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - Adopted RV#26 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-06 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-02-04 | House | Record vote RV#26 |
2019-02-04 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed |