TX HCR52 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Record vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Record vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Title
Urging Congress to reimburse the State of Texas for bearing the financial burden of the federal government's responsibility to secure the Texas-Mexico international border.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - House - Adopted RV#1249 (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | House | Adopted |
2017-05-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed |