TX HCR51 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Heart Hospital of Austin and St. David's HealthCare for providing exceptional cardiovascular care.
Title
Commending Heart Hospital of Austin and St. David's HealthCare for providing exceptional cardiovascular care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-02-16 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Signed in the House | |
2011-02-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-02-14 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-02-14 | Adopted | |
2011-02-14 | Read | |
2011-02-14 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Received from the House | |
2011-02-09 | Adopted | |
2011-02-09 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-07 | Filed |