TX HCR47 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2017.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2017, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - Adopted RV#16 (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-01-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Read |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-01-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-01-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |