TX HCR46 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 25 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 31, 2017.
Title
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on January 31, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - Adopted RV#14 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - Adopted RV#14 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-01-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-01-24 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-01-17 | House | Record vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |