TX HCR46 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to require the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs to provide VA services to incarcerated veterans detained in state hospitals and to consider expanding such services to all incarcerated veterans.
Title
Urging Congress to require the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs to provide VA services to incarcerated veterans detained in state hospitals and to consider expanding such services to all incarcerated veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - House - HCR 46Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress