TX HCR45 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Frank Salvato on his retirement as assistant city manager of Midland.
Title
Congratulating Frank Salvato on his retirement as assistant city manager of Midland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-02-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-02-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-06 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed |