TX HCR45 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to bestow the Congressional Medal of Honor on Doris "Dorie" Miller for his heroism during World War II.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to bestow the Congressional Medal of Honor on Doris "Dorie" Miller for his heroism during World War II.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - House - Adopted RV#487 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateAdopted
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-16SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-01SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-27HouseRecord vote
2017-04-27HouseAdopted
2017-04-27HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-05HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-05HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2017-01-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback