TX HCR44 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on February 8, 2011.
Title
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on February 8, 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-07 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2011-02-07 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-02-03 | Signed in the House | |
2011-02-03 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-02 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-02-01 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-02-01 | Adopted | |
2011-02-01 | Read | |
2011-02-01 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-01-27 | Record vote | |
2011-01-27 | Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Rules suspended | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |