TX HCR42 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the city of Rockwall as the official Live Music Capital of North Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the city of Rockwall as the official Live Music Capital of North Texas for a 10-year period beginning in 2017.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1400 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Adopted RV#723 (Y: 142 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-21SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-20HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-19HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseRecord vote
2017-05-19HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-15HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-12SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-12SenateAdopted
2017-05-12SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-12SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HouseAdopted
2017-05-04HouseLaid before the House
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-28HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-27HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-27HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-27HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2017-01-02HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback