TX HCR39 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Commending Edinburg Mayor Joe Ochoa for his years of service.
Title
Commending Edinburg Mayor Joe Ochoa for his years of service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-02-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-02-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Signed in the House | |
2009-02-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-02-17 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-02-17 | Read & adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Received from the House | |
2009-02-10 | Adopted | |
2009-02-10 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |