TX HCR38 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on February 5, 2019.
Title
Inviting the governor to address a joint session of the legislature on February 5, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Adopted RV#22 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Adopted RV#22 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-01-30 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-01-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-01-29 | House | Record vote RV#22 |
2019-01-29 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed |