TX HCR36 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification a federal balanced budget amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2016-11-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BALANCED BUDGET
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress