TX HCR36 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the Parental Rights Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the Parental Rights Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Burkett [R] | Rep. Dan Flynn [R] | Rep. Charlie Geren [R] | Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] |
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Matt Krause [R] | Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. John Raney [R] | Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R] | Rep. Stuart Spitzer [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - HCR 36Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Adopted |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-01-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PARENTAL RIGHTS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution