TX HCR36 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating February 16 as Texas Homemade Pie Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2013.
Title
Designating February 16 as Texas Homemade Pie Day for a 10-year period beginning in 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - HCR 36Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-08 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Adopted |
2013-04-11 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-03-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HOMEMADE PIE DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--10-Year Significant Dates