TX HCR33 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to consider the removal of trade, financial, and travel restrictions relating to Cuba.
Title
Urging Congress to consider the removal of trade, financial, and travel restrictions relating to Cuba.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to International Trade & Intergovernmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2016-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
CUBA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
CUBA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HCR33 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HC00033I.htm |