TX HCR33 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Dr. Barry B. Thompson, The Texas A&M University System chancellor emeritus and Tarleton State University president emeritus.
Title
In memory of Dr. Barry B. Thompson, The Texas A&M University System chancellor emeritus and Tarleton State University president emeritus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-03-12 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2014-12-11 | House | Filed |