TX HCR32 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - No action taken in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the Bowie knife as the official State Knife of Texas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the Bowie knife as the official State Knife of Texas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Adopted RV#319 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateNo action taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-03SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-03SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HouseAdopted
2017-04-20HouseLaid before the House
2017-04-19HouseRules suspended
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-10HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-15HouseReferred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback