TX HCR28 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-06 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Designating March 2 to March 3, 2009, as Tyler Days at the State Capitol.
Title
Designating March 2 to March 3, 2009, as Tyler Days at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Sen. Kevin Eltife [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-03-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-03-04 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Signed in the House | |
2009-03-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-03 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-03-03 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-03 | Adopted | |
2009-03-03 | Read | |
2009-03-03 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-02 | Received from the House | |
2009-02-26 | Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-02-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-02 | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TYLER DAYS
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TYLER DAYS