TX HCR268 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to name a permanent facility at The University of Texas of the Permian Basin in honor of Buddy and Shirley West.
Title
Directing the Texas Facilities Commission to name a permanent facility at The University of Texas of the Permian Basin in honor of Buddy and Shirley West.
Sponsors
Rep. Delwin Jones [R] | Rep. James Keffer [R] | Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Thomas Merritt [R] |
Rep. Jim Pitts [R] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Adopted | |
2009-06-01 | Read | |
2009-06-01 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-28 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-28 | Record vote | |
2009-05-28 | Adopted | |
2009-05-28 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-26 | Filed |
Subjects
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS OF THE PERMIAN BASIN
WEST, GEORGE E. "BUDDY", REP.
WEST, SHIRLEY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS OF THE PERMIAN BASIN
WEST, GEORGE E. "BUDDY", REP.
WEST, SHIRLEY